EP2915463 - Food-preparation device comprising a supply shaft associated with a cup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/37] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lafond, Jean-Marie 4 rue du Pradet 65420 Ibos / FR | 02 /
Peyras, Lionel 46 bis route de Bagnères 65100 Lourdes / FR | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | Cémeli, Eric Philippe Laurent SEB Développement SAS Campus SEB 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [2017/04] |
Former [2015/37] | Cémeli, Eric Philippe Laurent SEB Développement Service Propriété Industrielle Les 4 M - Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15157660.0 | 04.03.2015 | [2015/37] | Priority number, date | FR20140051906 | 07.03.2014 Original published format: FR 1451906 | [2015/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2915463 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2915463 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47J19/02 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
A47J19/02 (EP,US);
A47J43/255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2015/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Lebensmittelzubereitung, die einen mit einer Kapelle verbundenen Zuführschacht umfasst | [2015/37] | English: | Food-preparation device comprising a supply shaft associated with a cup | [2015/37] | French: | Dispositif de preparation d'aliments comportant une cheminée d'alimentation associée à une coupelle | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/37] | Dispositif de preparation d aliments comportant une cheminee d alimentation associee a une coupelle | Examination procedure | 08.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 04.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2015 | AL | 25.01.2017 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | ES | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | HR | 25.01.2017 | IT | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | MK | 25.01.2017 | MT | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | PL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | RS | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | SM | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | IE | 04.03.2017 | LU | 04.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | NO | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.03.2015 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
TR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 04.03.2015 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.03.2015 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.03.2015 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]KR20020063643 (DONG AH OSCAR CO LTD [KR]) [AD] 1-15 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]CN201213690Y (QIULEI HU [CN]) [AD] 1-15 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2967034 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 24 - page 11, line 26; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | KR20020063643 |