EP3064602 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ELEMENTAL RHODIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstr. 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stettner, Martin Bornfelderstr. 14 63674 Altenstadt / DE | 02 /
Thiel, Vasco Finkenweg 20 64832 Babenhausen / DE | 03 /
Fuchs Alameda, Stefanie Schulstraße 28 63599 Biebergemünd / DE | 04 /
Voss, Steffen Dolmenring 14 63694 Limeshain / DE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Heraeus IP Heraeus Business Solutions GmbH Intellectual Property Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Heraeus IP Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 15157697.2 | 05.03.2015 | [2016/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064602 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/00 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
C22B11/00 (EP,US);
C22B11/06 (KR);
C22B11/04 (CN,US);
C22B3/44 (US);
C22B5/00 (US);
C22B7/006 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von elementarem Rhodium | [2016/36] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ELEMENTAL RHODIUM | [2016/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À LA FABRICATION DE RHODIUM ÉLÉMENTAIRE | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 14.09.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0363314 (WALTHER CONSULTING GRUPP BADEN [CH]) [A] 1-15 * claim 10 *; | [A]GB2247888 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]JP2009242812 (NIPPON MINING CO) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US7935173 (THOMAS JOSEPH L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 13 *; | [A] - KOVALEV ET AL, "Dynamic Sorption Preconcentration of Platinum Metals", MENDELEEV COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (19950101), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1070/MC1995V005N03ABEH000482, ISSN 0959-9436, pages 111 - 112, XP022528934 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/MC1995v005n03ABEH000482 | [A] - HERMAN G JULSING AND ROBERT I MCCRINDLE, "The use of sodium formate for the recovery of precious metals from acidic base metal effluents", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 76, no. 4, doi:10.1002/JCTB.385, ISSN 0268-2575, (20010401), pages 349 - 354, (20010330), XP001577429 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jctb.385 |