EP3064399 - Pivotal and detachable tightening strap arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brenderup AB Box 128 553 13 Jönköping / SE | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stork, Joakim Kungsgatan 27 553 31 JÖNKÖPING / SE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Awapatent AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 15157807.7 | 05.03.2015 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064399 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3064399 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/08 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
B60P7/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schwenkbare und abnehmbare Spannbandanordnung | [2016/36] | English: | Pivotal and detachable tightening strap arrangement | [2016/36] | French: | Dispositif à sangle de serrage pivotant et détachable | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 08.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2015 | AL | 31.01.2018 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | ES | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | IE | 05.03.2018 | LU | 05.03.2018 | MT | 05.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
MT | 05.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
MT | 05.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
MT | 05.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
MT | 05.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202010006966U (BERL ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0026]; figure - *; | [A]US6626621 (HUGG RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 11; figure - *; | [A]EP0008240 (THOMAS ALLAN ROBERT) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1591311 (BEKAERT HANDLING LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3924534 (BAUMA GEORG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |