EP2924403 - SENSOR DEVICE, MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A SENSOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN ITEM OF INFORMATION RELATING TO A TEMPERATURE AND/OR RELATING TO RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utermoehlen, Fabian Vogelsangstrasse 145b 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 15157837.4 | 05.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | DE201410205863 | 28.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014205863 | [2015/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924403 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/20 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
G01J5/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sensorvorrichtung, Herstellungsverfahren für eine Sensorvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ermitteln einer Information bezüglich einer Temperatur und/oder bezüglich einer Strahlung | [2015/40] | English: | SENSOR DEVICE, MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A SENSOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN ITEM OF INFORMATION RELATING TO A TEMPERATURE AND/OR RELATING TO RADIATION | [2015/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE CAPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE INFORMATION CONCERNANT UNE TEMPÉRATURE ET/OU UN RAYONNEMENT | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2573530 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [I] 1-4,7-11 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0037] , [ 0040] *; | [I]US2012091342 (BERGER ISRAEL [IL], et al) [I] 1,5,6 * figures 6, 12 * * paragraph [0047] *; | [I]US2009321641 (PARK KUN SIK [KR], et al) [I] 1,8,9 * the whole document * | [A] - CHI-WOO LEE ET AL, "High-Temperature Performance of Silicon Junctionless MOSFETs", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100301), vol. 57, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 620 - 625, XP011300671 [A] 2-4,10,11 * figures 2, 4 * | by applicant | DE102006028435 |