EP2937262 - Baby stroller seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dorel France SA 9, boulevard du Poitou BP 905 49309 Cholet Cedex / FR | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Ping-Ching No.14, Jili 5th St., Zhongli Dist. 330 Taoyuan City / TW | 02 /
Chang, Chen-Tai No. 117-2 Jioupi Village 612 Taibao City, Chiayi County / TW | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15158068.5 | 06.03.2015 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | CN201420102522U | 07.03.2014 Original published format: CN 201420102522 U | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2937262 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2937262 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/06, B62B7/14 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
B62B7/06 (EP);
B62B7/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2015/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kinderwagensitz | [2015/44] | English: | Baby stroller seat | [2015/44] | French: | Siège de poussette d'enfant | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 25.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]CN103359146 (ZHONGSHAN LERADO DAILY ARTICLE) [XD] 1 * figures 5-9 * [A] 3-7 [Y] 2; | [Y]US2002197102 (CHENG YING-HSIUNG [TW]) [Y] 2 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB2496225 (UNIQUE PRODUCT & DESIGN CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010040644 (SCS LONDON LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN103359146 |