EP2919212 - Integrated lock and pin security tag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Checkpoint Systems, Inc. 101 Wolf Drive Thorofare, NJ 08086 / US | [2019/44] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Checkpoint Systems, Inc. 101 Wolf Drive Thorofare, NJ 08086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piccoli, Anthony F. 105 Brent Court WEST DEPTFORD, NJ New Jersey 08086 / US | 02 /
Strauser, Seth 1437 Swan Lane MULLICA HILL, NJ New Jersey 08062 / US | 03 /
Wu, Wei Room 34, No. 31 ShangNan 5th Block Pudong District 200126 Shanghai / CN | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2015/38] | Mola, Edoardo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 15158481.0 | 10.03.2015 | [2015/38] | Priority number, date | US201461951339P | 11.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461951339 P | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2919212 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2919212 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, E05B45/00, E05B73/00, G08B13/24 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
G08B13/2434 (EP,US);
E05B73/0017 (EP,US);
G08B13/1445 (EP,US);
G08B13/1463 (EP,US);
G08B13/2417 (EP,US);
G08B13/2437 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2015/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsverschluss mit integrierter Sperrvorrichtung | [2015/38] | English: | Integrated lock and pin security tag | [2015/38] | French: | Broche et étiquette de sécurité de verrouillage intégrées | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 13.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2015 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | IE | 10.03.2020 | LU | 10.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.03.2015 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2006127674 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,11-15 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 19, paragraph 2; figures 15-20 * [A] 7,8,10; | [XA]US2010287998 (ANDERSON LUIS E [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0033] - [0048]; figures 2-9 * [A] 2-13,15; | [A]US2012204608 (SAYEGH ADEL O [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0032] - [0035] * |