Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
07.10.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.07.2018 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.03.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.03.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.02.2018 | First examination report | |
16.02.2018 | Change - representative | |
18.09.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
18.09.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.05.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.05.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
13.05.2016 | Change - designated states | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.11.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
17.03.2015 | Change - representative |