blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2940678

EP2940678 - DISPLAY MOUNTING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
K-International, Inc.
3333 Oak Grove Avenue
Waukegan, IL 60087 / US
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / White, Michael J.
W1734 White Circle
Ripon, WI 54971 / US
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/45]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date15158883.712.03.2015
[2015/45]
Priority number, dateUS201461953214P14.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461953214 P
US20141424889909.04.2014         Original published format: US201414248899
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2940678
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2015
ClassificationIPC:G09F7/18, G09F15/02, G09F7/20, A47F13/06, A47G1/16, B25J1/04, B25B5/04, B25B9/00, E04B9/00, G09F7/22
[2015/45]
CPC:
G09F7/18 (EP,US); A47F13/06 (EP,US); A47G1/1686 (EP,US);
B25B5/04 (EP,US); B25B5/06 (EP,US); B25J1/04 (US);
G09F7/22 (EP,US); E04B9/006 (EP,US); G09F2007/1847 (US);
G09F2007/1852 (EP,US); G09F2007/186 (EP,US); Y10T29/49826 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
Former [2015/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEMONTAGESYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2015/45]
English:DISPLAY MOUNTING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/45]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE D'AFFICHES[2015/45]
Examination procedure04.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/24]
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/07]
08.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201703   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2017
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US5188332  (CALLAS MIKE T [US]);
 [XI]US5381991  (STOCKER HAROLD L [US]);
 [YA]FR2936896  (LACROIX JEAN PAUL [FR])
ExaminationWO9525323
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.