EP2918720 - SEWING MACHINE AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM STORING COMPUTER-READABLE INSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokura, Masashi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-1 Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2015/38] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15158900.9 | 12.03.2015 | [2015/38] | Priority number, date | JP20140051148 | 14.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014051148 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2918720 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2918720 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D05B19/08, D05B19/10, D05C5/06 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
D05B19/08 (EP,US);
D05B19/10 (EP,US);
D05B21/00 (US);
D05C5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NÄHMASCHINE UND ÜBERGANGSLOSES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM MIT DARAUF GESPEICHERTEN COMPUTERLESBAREN ANWEISUNGEN | [2015/38] | English: | SEWING MACHINE AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM STORING COMPUTER-READABLE INSTRUCTIONS | [2015/38] | French: | MACHINE À COUDRE ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR STOCKANT DES INSTRUCTIONS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR NON TRANSITOIRE | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 29.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2015 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | IE | 12.03.2017 | LU | 12.03.2017 | MT | 12.03.2017 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 12.03.2015 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.03.2015 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 12.03.2015 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.03.2015 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2366823 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,14 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0096]; figures 1-15 * [A] 2-13; | [YA]US2008103624 (YAMADA KENJI [JP]) [Y] 1,14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1-13 * [A] 2-13; | [A]US2007233310 (YAMADA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0194]; figures 1-37 * | by applicant | JP2009201704 |