EP3070401 - ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lunux GmbH Mergenthalerstr. 6 30880 Laatzen / DE | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/17] | For all designated states Lunux GmbH Mergenthalerstr. 6 80880 Germany / DE | ||
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerpe, Alexander Wiedenbrücker Str. 12 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
Möller, Dennis Neuer Weg 4 59556 Lippstadt / DE | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Jöstingmeier, Martin, et al Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/38] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 15159093.2 | 13.03.2015 | [2016/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3070401 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3070401 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21V27/02, F21V31/00, F21V31/04, F21V23/06, H01L33/56, // F21Y115/10, F21Y105/10 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
F21V31/005 (EP);
F21V19/004 (EP);
F21V23/06 (EP);
F21V27/02 (EP);
F21V31/04 (EP);
H01L33/54 (EP);
H01L33/56 (EP);
F21Y2105/10 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP);
H01L33/58 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | F21V27/02, F21V31/00, F21V31/04, F21V23/06, H01L33/56, F21Y105/00, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2016/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 21.03.2017 | ME | 21.03.2017 | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/21] | English: | ILLUMINATION DEVICE | [2016/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2016/38] |
Former [2016/38] | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 13.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 26.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2015 | AL | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | IE | 13.03.2018 | LU | 13.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.03.2015 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2014019953 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [I] 1,2,4-6 * figures 3-10 * * pages 5-8 * [Y] 3,7-10; | [I]EP2317206 (LIANG MENG PLASTIC SHARE CO LTD [TW]) [I] 1-10 * figures 4, 5, 7-10, 13 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] *; | [Y]DE20015359U (BAEDJE K H METEOR GUMMIWERKE [DE]) [Y] 3,7-10 * figure 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004111284 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 7-10 * figures 4, 5, 7 * * the whole document *; | [A]DE102008034294 (BROLL SYSTEMTECHNIK KG [DE]) [A] 7-10 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0 22] - [0030] *; | [E]EP2857744 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [E] 1,2,4-6,10 * figures 1, 2, 3, 5, 6 * * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0 28] - [0038] * | by applicant | WO2007064701 | EP1657758 |