EP2914069 - Variable-effect lighting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharos Innovations Inc. 258 Salem Avenue Toronto ON M6H 3C7 / CA | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruxton, James 258 Salem Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6H 3C7 / CA | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Hartig, Michael Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Hartig, Michael Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15159208.6 | 16.08.2006 | [2015/36] | Priority number, date | CN20051092007 | 16.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510092007 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2914069 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, G05D25/02, H05B33/08 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
H05B45/44 (EP,US);
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
H05B47/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2015/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungssystem mit variablen Effekten | [2015/36] | English: | Variable-effect lighting system | [2015/36] | French: | Système d'éclairage à effets variables | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 26.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06775119.8 / EP1929843 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]CA2371167 (PHAROS INNOVATIONS INC [CA]) [X] 1-3 * page 17; figure 1c * [A] 6-8 [Y] 4,5; | [YA]WO0124146 (EVERBRITE INC [US]) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,6-8; | [A]WO03069223 (POLARIS POOL SYS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5008595 | US5420482 | US4317071 | GB2244358 |