EP2921974 - DATA RESTORATION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wen, Jijun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District 518129, P.R. Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Nie, Yuanyuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District 518129, P.R. Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Xu, Wentao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District 518129, P.R. Shenzhen / CN | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 15159366.2 | 17.03.2015 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | CN2014199107 | 17.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410099107 | [2015/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921974 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06F11/1469 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2015/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENWIEDERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2015/39] | English: | DATA RESTORATION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2015/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RESTAURATION DE DONNÉES | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 12.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007098380 (ARCHIVAS INC [US]) [Y] 2 * page 8 - page 8 ** page 10 - page 10 *; | [XY]US2013151895 (LEE SEUNG WON [KR]) [X] 1,3-14 * page 3 - page 4 * [Y] 2 |