EP3070173 - Process for manufacturing propionate products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PURAC Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Visser, Diana Purac Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchen / NL | 02 /
Meijer, Jasper Purac Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchen / NL | 03 /
Soares Mendes, Filipa Cristina Purac Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchen / NL | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Hesselink, Dinah Elisabeth, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 15159568.3 | 18.03.2015 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3070173 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/52 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
C12P7/52 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C53/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Propionat-Produkten | [2016/38] | English: | Process for manufacturing propionate products | [2016/38] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de produits de propionate | [2016/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DUARTE ET AL, "Microbial production of propionic and succinic acid from sorbitol using Propionibacterium acidipropionici", AMB EXPRESS, (20150220), vol. 5, pages 1 - 8, XP002738774 [A] 1-10 * See pages 1-2 (Introduction) and page 6 (Table 5); online publication * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/S13568-015-0095-6 | [A] - DISHISHA ET AL, "Improved propionic acid production from glycerol: combining cyclic batch- and sequential batch fermentations with optimal nutrient composition", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (20141111), vol. 176, pages 80 - 87, XP029103745 [A] 1-10 * See pages 80-81 (Introduction); early online publication * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2014.11.013 | [A] - STOWERS ET AL, "Development of an industrializable fermentation process for propionic acid production", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2014), vol. 41, pages 837 - 852, XP035330832 [A] 1-10 * See page 841 (Table 1) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10295-014-1423-6 | [A] - DISHISHA ET AL, "An economical biorefinery process for propionic acid production from glycerol and potato juice using high cell density fermentation", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2013), vol. 135, pages 504 - 512, XP028579581 [A] 1-10 * See pages 504-505 (Introduction) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2012.08.098 | [A] - LIU ET AL, "Glycerol/glucose co-fermentation: One more proficient process to produce propionic acid by Propionibacterium acidipropionici", CURRENT MICROBIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 62, pages 152 - 158, XP019869364 [A] 1-10 * See page 154 (Table 1) and page 157 (Figure 4) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00284-010-9683-5 | [A] - KOSMIDER ET AL, "Propionic acid production by Propionibacterium freudenreichii ssp. shermanii using crude glycerol and whey lactose industrial wastes", POLISH JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES, (2010), vol. 19, pages 1249 - 1253, XP002738776 [A] 1-10 * See pages 1252-1253 (Conclusions) * | by applicant | - ZHU ET AL., "describes a fermentation process for the manufacture of calcium propionate wherein glycerol is fermented using Propionibacterium acidipropionici", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 101, pages 8902 - 8902 |