EP2966845 - Parking management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobydom Ltd. 51 Nili Street Raanana 43206 / IL | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeitman, Shlomo Mobydom Ltd. 51 Nili Street 43206 Raanana / IL | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Finnegan Europe LLP 16 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15160279.4 | 07.07.1997 | [2016/02] | Priority number, date | IL19960118898 | 21.07.1996 Original published format: IL 11889896 | US19970795969 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: US 795969 | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2966845 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00, G07B15/02, G07F7/00, G07F17/24 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G06Q20/127 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (KR);
G06Q20/16 (EP,US);
G06Q20/326 (EP,KR,US);
G07B15/02 (EP,US);
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2016/02] | Title | German: | Parkmanagmentsystem | [2016/02] | English: | Parking management system | [2016/02] | French: | Système de gestion du stationnement | [2016/02] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97928416.3 / EP1004196 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 20   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9320539 (JONSSON TOMMY [SE]) [A] 1,8* figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0646897 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,8,13 * abstract * * page EP064689, column 1, line 29 - column 6, line 39; figure - *; | [X]US5432508 (JACKSON WAYNE B [US]) [X] 1-4,8,9,11-13 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 28 * * figure -; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE4433982 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 37 - line L * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 1 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 8 * * figure -; claim - *; | [XI]WO9601531 (KARBASI AMIR KIUMARS [FI], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 30 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 13-15 |