EP2905004 - Operatingmechanism for a wheelchair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/33] | Method for operating a wheelchair | ||
[2016/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Junker, Thyl Edenkobenerstr. 1 50739 Köln / DE | For all designated states Pagano, Roman Vaalser Straße 15 52064 Aachen / DE | For all designated states Levedag, Daniel Aachener Straße 3 50674 Köln / DE | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 15161158.9 | 31.10.2013 | [2015/33] | Priority number, date | DE20121021592 | 02.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012021592 | [2015/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2905004 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2905004 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/02, A61G5/10 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A61G5/023 (EP);
A61G5/025 (EP);
A61G5/027 (EP);
A61G5/1054 (EP);
A61G5/1072 (EP);
F04C2270/0421 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung für einen Rollstuhl | [2016/52] | English: | Operatingmechanism for a wheelchair | [2016/52] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement d'un fauteuil roulant | [2016/52] |
Former [2015/33] | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Rollstuhls | ||
Former [2015/33] | Method for operating a wheelchair | ||
Former [2015/33] | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un fauteuil roulant | Examination procedure | 03.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 09.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13005159.2 / EP2727568 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2013 | AL | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | MT | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | GB | 31.10.2017 | IE | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | LU | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
IE | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
IE | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
IE | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
IE | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.10.2013 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
IE | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
IE | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
GB | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
LU | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE121860 (DR. DUDLEY ALLEN SARGENT) [X] 1,2 * page 1, column 1, line 24 - page 2, column 1, line 11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB191005907 (RUPLEY DANIEL [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 1 - line 29 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US6032976 (ALEXANDER DALVA R [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 59 - line 67 * * figures 1-5 * |