EP2923659 - POWER MANAGEMENT CONTROL SYSTEMS FOR SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2017/34] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leimbach, Richard L. 2901 Markbreit Avenue Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45209 / US | 02 /
Overmyer, Mark D. 3784 O'Leary Avenue Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45236 / US | 03 /
Adams, Shane R. 919 Evergreen Park Lane Lebanon, OH Ohio 45036 / US | 04 /
Swensgard, Brett E. 7936 Orchard Court West Chester, OH Ohio 45069 / US | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 15161163.9 | 26.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | US201414226106 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: US201414226106 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2923659 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2923659 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923659 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0686 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (US);
A61B18/1445 (EP,CN,US);
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
A61L2/07 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2/081 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2/082 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2/087 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2/16 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2/206 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2/26 (EP,US);
B25F3/00 (EP,US);
B25F5/00 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/425 (EP,CN,US);
H01R35/025 (CN,US);
H01R39/08 (EP,US);
H01R39/10 (EP,US);
H02J5/00 (US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00039 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00119 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00123 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00137 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00212 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00221 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00225 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00407 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2912 (EP);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/302 (EP);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0803 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0807 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0808 (EP,US);
A61B2090/081 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0814 (EP,US);
A61B34/76 (EP,US);
A61B90/06 (EP);
A61B90/90 (EP,US);
A61L2202/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2010/4278 (CN,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,CN,US);
H01R2201/12 (EP,US);
H01R39/64 (EP,US);
H02J2310/23 (EP);
H02J7/007188 (EP,US);
H02J7/007192 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSSTEUERSYSTEME FÜR CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTE | [2015/40] | English: | POWER MANAGEMENT CONTROL SYSTEMS FOR SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS | [2015/40] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE DE GESTION DE PUISSANCE POUR INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 08.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17188417.4 / EP3326545 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2015 | AL | 30.08.2017 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | RS | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 26.03.2018 | LU | 26.03.2018 | MT | 26.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.03.2015 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
MT | 26.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.03.2015 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
MT | 26.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
MT | 26.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
MT | 26.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
MT | 26.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 26.03.2018 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 26.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2090238 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0050] , [0 97]; figures 1, 2, 7, 14 * [A] 2-6; | [X]US2011172689 (SMITH KEVIN W [US], et al) [X] 1* paragraphs [0104] , [ 140] , [ 145] , [ 186] , [ 187]; figures 3, 39 *; | [X]US2014005668 (RHEE SORA [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0118] , [ 193]; figures 11, 51 * | by applicant | US5403312 | US2010089970 | US8210411 | US2012298719 | US20080031573 |