EP2928077 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR SMOOTHLY MANAGING AUDIO DISCONTINUITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices Global 3rd Floor, Par La Ville Place 14 Par La Ville Road Hamilton / BM | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bregnsbo, Axel Bogdan c/o Analog Devices Inc One Technology Way Norwood, MA Massachusetts 02062 / US | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Thompson, Andrew John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Beck, Simon Antony Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15161771.9 | 30.03.2015 | [2015/41] | Priority number, date | US201414244227 | 03.04.2014 Original published format: US201414244227 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928077 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/30, H03G7/00 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H03G3/3005 (EP,US);
G06F3/165 (US);
H03G3/3089 (EP,US);
H03G7/002 (EP,US);
H03G7/007 (EP,US);
H04R29/00 (US);
H04R2430/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2015/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SANFTEN VERWALTUNG VON AUDIODISKONTINUITÄT | [2015/41] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR SMOOTHLY MANAGING AUDIO DISCONTINUITY | [2015/41] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT LA GESTION EN DOUCEUR D'UNE DISCONTINUITÉ AUDIO | [2015/41] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6259793 (WASHIO NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 17; figures 1-16 * [I] 2-9,11-14; | [X]US2004264715 (LU PHILLIP [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2608405 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]EP2610865 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraphs [0059] , [0071] , [0077] , [0082] , [0083] , [0089]; figures 1-4,6 * |