EP2933905 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF MOTOR VIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Mark 17344 Pavelka Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | 02 /
Bronk, Kelly J. 765 Chief Kewaskum Place Kewaskum, WI 53040 / US | 03 /
Qian, Wei 5-11-301 Vanke City Garden 3333 Qixin Road Shanghai 201101 / CN | 04 /
Yuan, Zhenhuan Room 502, No. 165, Block 10 Jinqiu Garden Lane, 699 Jinqiu Road District Baoshan Shanghai 200444 / CN | 05 /
Ramanarayanan, Shankernarayan 7485 Paulsen Drive Eden Prairie, MN / US | 06 /
Sawant, Manas 3556 Ambassador Drive, Apt. 1 Madison, WI 53718 / US | 07 /
Feng, Shun 5200 Lincoln Drive, Apt. 216 Edina, MN / US | 08 /
Schmidt, Robert H. N103 W16894 Wildrose Lane Germantown, WI 53022 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2015/43] | 01 /
Cooper, Mark 17344 Pavelka Drive Eden Prairie MN Minnesota 55346 / US | ||
02 /
Bronk, Kelly J. 765 Chief Kewaskum Place Kewaskum WI Wisconsin 53040 / US | |||
03 /
Qian, Wei 5-11-301 Vanke City Garden 3333 Qixin Road 201101 Shanghai / CN | |||
04 /
Yuan, Zhenhuan Room 502, No. 165, Block 10 Jinqiu Garden Lane, 699 Jinqiu Road, District Baoshan 200444 Shanghai / CN | |||
05 /
Ramanarayanan, Shankernarayan 7485 Paulsen Drive Eden Prairie MN Minnesota / US | |||
06 /
Sawant, Manas 3556 Ambassador Drive, Apt. 1 Madison, WI Wisconsin 53718 / US | |||
07 /
Feng, Shun 5200 Lincoln Drive, Apt. 216 Edina MN Minnesota / US | |||
08 /
Schmidt, Robert H. N103 W16894 Wildrose Lane Germantown WI Wisconsin 53022 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 15161868.3 | 31.03.2015 | [2015/43] | Priority number, date | US201414243353 | 02.04.2014 Original published format: US201414243353 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2933905 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2933905 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933905 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00, H02K5/24 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
H02K11/20 (EP,US);
G01M1/14 (US);
H02P21/14 (US);
H02K5/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2015/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON MOTORSCHWINGUNG | [2015/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF MOTOR VIBRATION | [2015/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE VIBRATION DE MOTEUR | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2015 | AL | 24.03.2021 | AT | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | CZ | 24.03.2021 | DK | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | ES | 24.03.2021 | FI | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | IT | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | LV | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | MK | 24.03.2021 | MT | 24.03.2021 | NL | 24.03.2021 | PL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SE | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SK | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | IE | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | LU | 31.03.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | NO | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.03.2015 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
MK | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 31.03.2015 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 31.03.2015 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
NO | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6138078 (CANADA RONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 9 - line 26; figures 1, 4, 5 * * column 7, line 48 - line 51 * * column 15, line 17 - line 31; figure 10 *; | [XY]EP1696070 (ASKOLL HOLDING SRL [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0036] , [0039]; figure - * [Y] 6,7,13,14; | [X]US2006192508 (ALBERS THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figure - *; | [A]US2007071057 (OHTA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2466472 (WRC PLC [GB]) [A] 3,4* page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [XY]US2012181965 (CHAMBERLIN BRADLEY D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8-12,15 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,13,14; | [X]US2014042876 (BROCKERHOFF PHILIP GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0 14] , [ 23] , [0 34] , [0 35] , [0 37]; figure .; claims 3, 9, 10, 21, 22 * |