EP2929774 - HAYMAKING MACHINE EQUIPPED WITH AN IMPROVED DEFLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gantzer, Christian 28 Rue Saint Jean 57915 Woustviller / FR | 02 /
Diebold, Bertrand 1, Impasse des Vosges 67190 Gresswiller / FR | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Hager, Esther Evelyne Kuhn SAS 4 Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Esch, Esther Evelyne Kuhn S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | Application number, filing date | 15162526.6 | 07.04.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | FR20140053092 | 08.04.2014 Original published format: FR 1453092 | [2015/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929774 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2929774 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01D78/10 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
A01D78/1071 (EP,US);
A01D57/28 (US);
A01D78/1085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEUWERBUNGSMASCHINE MIT PERFEKTIONIERTEM ABLENKER | [2015/42] | English: | HAYMAKING MACHINE EQUIPPED WITH AN IMPROVED DEFLECTOR | [2015/42] | French: | MACHINE POUR LA RÉCOLTE DE FOURRAGE PRÉSENTANT UN DÉFLECTEUR PERFECTIONNÉ | [2015/42] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 07.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2015 | AL | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | MT | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | RS | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | LU | 07.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.04.2015 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.04.2015 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0526365 (KUHN SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9400521U (KUHN SA [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0845199 (KUHN SA [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1076482 (KUHN SA [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US6272826 (MENICHETTI SILVANO [IT], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | FR1350393 |