EP2933006 - WATER DRAIN FITTING WITH FILTER, CONNECTING PIECE FOR CONNECTION TO A WATER DRAIN FITTING AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WATER DRAINAGE FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünbeck Wasseraufbereitung GmbH Josef-Grünbeck-Straße 1 89420 Höchstäd a.d. Donau / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Grünbeck Wasseraufbereitung GmbH Josef-Grübeck-Straße 1 89420 Höchstädt/Dachau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Söcknick, Ralf, Dr. Urbanstraße 32 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/43] | Charrier, Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15162608.2 | 07.04.2015 | [2015/43] | Priority number, date | DE201410105532 | 17.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014105532 | [2015/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933006 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933006 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, C02F1/02, E03C1/10, B01D35/04, C02F1/28, E03C1/044, F24D17/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
B01D35/04 (EP);
B01D35/046 (EP);
C02F1/003 (EP);
C02F1/281 (EP);
E03C1/044 (EP);
E03C1/10 (EP);
F24D17/0073 (EP);
C02F1/02 (EP);
C02F2303/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | B01D35/04, C02F1/28, E03C1/044, F24D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2015/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WASSERAUSLAUFARMATUR MIT FILTER, ANSCHLUSSSTÜCK ZUM ANSCHLIESSEN AN EINE WASSERAUSLAUFARMATUR UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER WASSERAUSLAUFARMATUR | [2015/43] | English: | WATER DRAIN FITTING WITH FILTER, CONNECTING PIECE FOR CONNECTION TO A WATER DRAIN FITTING AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WATER DRAINAGE FIXTURE | [2015/43] | French: | ROBINETTERIE DE SORTIE D'EAU DOTÉE DE FILTRE, PIÈCE DE RACCORDEMENT À UNE ROBINETTERIE DE SORTIE D'EAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE ROBINETTERIE DE SORTIE D'EAU | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 09.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2015 | AL | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | MT | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.04.2015 | |
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.04.2015 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20301999U (IONOX WASSER TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010060142 (YEWDALL GARY [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010006508 (MITCHELL MICHAEL DONOVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102777680 (ZHEJIANG QINYUAN WATER PURIFIER SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN202100823U (QINGQIN XING) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0539069 (CULLIGAN INT CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - WEGMANN ET AL, "Modification of ceramic microfilters with colloidal zirconia to promote the adsorption of viruses from water", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071025), vol. 42, no. 6-7, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 1726 - 1734, XP022523717 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0539069 |