EP3078921 - METHOD FOR INTRODUCING AN ADHESIVE AND/OR SEALING SUBSTANCE INTO A GROOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buck, Manuel Vogelsangstrasse 7 5412 Gebenstorf / CH | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 15163029.0 | 09.04.2015 | [2016/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078921 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/52, B64C1/14, F24J2/46 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
F24S25/20 (EP);
F24S2025/601 (EP);
F24S2025/6013 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND WERKZEUG ZUM EINBRINGEN EINES KLEB- UND/ODER DICHTSTOFFES IN EINE FUGE ZWISCHEN EINEM RAHMEN UND EINEM VOM RAHMEN UMFASSTEN FLACHELEMENT | [2016/41] | English: | METHOD FOR INTRODUCING AN ADHESIVE AND/OR SEALING SUBSTANCE INTO A GROOVE | [2016/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INTRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET/OU ADHÉSIF DANS UN JOINT | [2016/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 09.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3341194 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * abstract * * page 22, line 16 - page 23, line 25 * [I] 6; | [Y]DE102012020355 (SGT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE19703269 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102010005570 (VM EDELSTAHLTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4327475 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4318854 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |