EP2933315 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR A MODIFYING COKING ADDITIVE BY DELAYED COKING OF RESIDUE OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obshhestvo S Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennost'yu "Promintekh" Ul. Bolshevistskaya 31 Perm 614000 / RU | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valyavin, Gennady Georgievich Prospekt Oktyabrya 180-68 450055 Ufa / RU | 02 /
Zaporin, Victor Pavlovich ul. Koltsevaya, 201/2-62 450068 Ufa / RU | 03 /
Sukhov, Sergei Vital'evich ul. Bashkirskaya, 14 450007 Ufa / RU | 04 /
Mamaev, Mikhail Vladimirovich ul. Marshala Tolbukhina, 3-17 614030 Perm / RU | 05 /
Bidilo, Igor Viktorovich ul. Blyukhera, 6, korp. A, 43 450075 Ufa / RU | 06 /
Valyavin, Konstantin Gennad'evich Prospekt Oktyabrya, 180-68 450055 Ufa / RU | 07 /
Stukov, Mikhail Ivanovich ul. Komsomolskaya, 47-25 620049 Ekaterinburg / RU | 08 /
Zagainov, Vladimir Semenovich ul. Bardina, 2/2-83 620149 Ekaterinburg / RU | 09 /
Gabbasov, Rishat Gayanovich ul. Kosmonavtov, d. 2 450062 Ufa / RU | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte PartG mbB Magirus-Deutz-Straße 12 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte Küfergasse 11 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 15163072.0 | 09.04.2015 | [2015/43] | Priority number, date | US201414252231 | 14.04.2014 Original published format: US201414252231 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933315 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C10B55/00, C10B57/06 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
C10B57/06 (EP,BR,US);
C10B55/00 (EP,BR,US);
C10B57/045 (BR);
C10G9/00 (BR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN MODIFIZIERENDES VERKOKUNGSADDITIV DURCH VERZÖGERTE VERKOKUNG VON RÜCKSTANDSÖL | [2015/43] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR A MODIFYING COKING ADDITIVE BY DELAYED COKING OF RESIDUE OIL | [2015/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ADDITIF DE MODIFICATION DE COKÉFACTION PAR COKÉFACTION RETARDÉE D'HUILE DE RÉSIDUS | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]RU2495078 (OOO PROMINTEKH [RU]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * * table 1 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]RU2469068 (GUP INST NEFTEKHIMPERERABOTKI RESPUB BASHKORTOSTAN GUP INKHP RB [RU]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO2012158064 (OBSCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOI OTVESTVENNOSTYU PROMINTEKH [RU]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 * * claims 1-4 *; | [XP]WO2015038023 (OBSHHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOI OTVETSTVENNOST YU PROMINTEKH [RU]) [XP] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-9 * | by applicant | RU2209826 | RU2400518 | - N. S. KAZANSKAYA; E. P. SMIDOVICH; E. P. SARKISYANTS, "Properties of Oil Cokes, Produced in the Presence of Hydrate of Potassium Oxide", IZVESTIYA VUZOV, (1974), pages 55 - 58 |