EP2962566 - PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINE JAK INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaney, Jeffrey c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way MS49 South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 02 /
Gibbons, Paul A. c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way MS49 South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 03 /
Hanan, Emily c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way MS49 South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 04 /
Lyssikatos, Joseph P. 42 Alta Avenue Piedmont, CA California 94611 / US | 05 /
Magnuson, Steven R. 3288 S. Bridgepoint Lane Dublin, CA California 94568 / US | 06 /
Pastor, Richard 243 Waller Street San Francisco, CA California 94102 / US | 07 /
Rawson, Thomas E. 140 Hamilton Avenue Mountain View, CA California 94043 / US | 08 /
Zhou, Aihe 1361 Stephen Way San Jose, CA California 95129 / US | 09 /
Zhu, Bing-Yan 135 Lois Lane Palo Alto, CA California 94303 / US | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 15163226.2 | 02.11.2009 | [2016/01] | Priority number, date | US20080110497 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: US 110497 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2962566 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/90, A61K31/519, C07D487/04, A61P35/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4184 (KR);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2016/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 06.07.2016 | BA | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | Title | German: | PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDIN-JAK-HEMMER-VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2016/01] | English: | PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINE JAK INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS AND METHODS | [2016/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS INHIBITEURS DE JAK DE PYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINE ET PROCÉDÉS | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 15.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09824234.0 / EP2348860 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004052315 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 24; claims 1-4,9,10 *; | [X]WO2007013673 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 20 - page 23; claim - *; | [A]WO2007082902 (M2000 [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A]WO2008004698 (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [E]WO2011006074 (ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15* example -; claim - * | by applicant | US4187099 | WO9615111 | - SCHINDLER ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 282, pages 20059 - 63 | - WILKS A.F., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 1603 - 1607 | - KISSELEVA ET AL., GENE, (2002), vol. 285, pages 1 - 24 | - LEVY ET AL., NAT. REV. MOL. CELL BIOL., (2005), vol. 3, pages 651 - 662 | - O'SHEA ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 109, pages S121 - S131 | - SCHEINECKER ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2009), vol. 8, pages 273 - 274 | - DAMESHEK, W., BLOOD, (1951), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 372 - 375 | - MORGAN, K.J; GILLILAND, D.G., ANN. REV. MED., (2008), vol. 59, pages 213 - 222 | - O'SHEA ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 109, pages S121 - S 131 | - BASLUND ET AL., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2005), vol. 52, pages 2686 - 2692 | - CHANGELIAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 302, pages 875 - 878 | - WATFORD, W.T.; O'SHEA, J.J, IMMUNITY, (2006), vol. 25, pages 695 - 697 | - KRUEGER, N. ENGL. J. MED., (2007), vol. 356, pages 580 - 92 | - REICH ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2009), vol. 8, pages 355 - 356 | - MANNON ET AL., N, ENGL. J. MED., (2004), vol. 351, pages 2069 - 79 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1960), vol. 82, page 5566 | - ANGEW CHEM. INTL. ED. ENGL, (1994), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - WILMAN, "Prodrugs in Cancer Chemotherapy", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (1986), vol. 14, pages 375 - 382 | - "Prodrugs: A Chemical Approach to Targeted Drug Delivery", STELLA ET AL., Directed Drug Delivery, HUMANA PRESS, (1985), pages 247 - 267 | - LOUIS F. FIESER; MARY FIESER, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, WILEY, (1967), vol. 1-19 | - Beilsteins Handbuch der organischen Chemie, SPRINGER-VERLAG | - LOCHMULLER, C. H., J. CHROMATOGR,, (1975), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 283 - 302 | - ELIEL, E.; WILEN, S., Stereochemistry of Organic Compounds, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., page 322 | - JACOB, J. ORG. CHEM., (1982), vol. 47, page 4165 | - OKAMOTO, J. OF CHROMATOGR., (1990), vol. 513, pages 375 - 378 | - SALTZMAN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2004), vol. 246, pages 627 - 633 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - SALTZMAN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (2004), vol. 246, pages 627 - 633 | - MORRISON, J.F., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1969), vol. 185, pages 269 - 296 | - WILLIAM, J.W.; MORRISON, J.F., METH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 63, pages 437 - 467 | - WILLIAM, J.W.; MORRISON, J.F., MCTH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 63, pages 437 - 467 | - GAVRIN, L.K. ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 1043 - 1046 |