EP2930619 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SHARED UTILISATION OF VIRTUALISED COMPUTING RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxeler Technologies Ltd. 3-4 Albion Place London W6 0QT / GB | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pell, Oliver 3-4 Albion Place London, W6 0QT / GB | 02 /
Sanders, Peter 3-4 Albion Place London, W6 0QT / GB | 03 /
Spooner, James Barry 3-4 Albion Place London, W6 0QT / GB | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15163281.7 | 10.04.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | US201414251391 | 11.04.2014 Original published format: US201414251391 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2930619 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2930619 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, // G06F9/38 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G06F9/5077 (EP,US);
G06F9/5044 (US);
G06F9/3877 (US);
G06F9/455 (US);
G06F9/5027 (US);
H04L47/821 (US);
G06F2009/45595 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE GEMEINSAME VERWENDUNG VON VIRTUALISIERTEN RECHNERRESSOURCEN | [2015/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SHARED UTILISATION OF VIRTUALISED COMPUTING RESOURCES | [2015/42] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE UTILISATION PARTAGÉE DE RESSOURCES DE CALCUL VIRTUALISÉES | [2015/42] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 03.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010058036 (DEGENARO LOUIS RALPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]US8418181 (SIROTA PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,5-11,15 * column 2, line 20 - line 25 * * column 2, line 38 - line 42 * * column 2, line 43 - line 49 * * column 3, line 42 - line 48 * * column 5, line 3 - line 7 * * column 8, line 1 - line 20 * * column 8, line 24 - line 29 * * column 16, line 15 - line 34 * * column 16, line 39 - line 43 * * column 17, line 60 - line 66 * * column 18, line 4 - line 7 * * column 18, line 43 - line 50 * * column 19, line 65 - column 20, line 5 * * column 20, line 61 - column 21, line 2 * * column 23, line 41 - line 46 * * column 25, line 54 - line 56 * * column 26, line 57 - line 65 * * column 30, line 66 - column 31, line 3 * * column 33, line 44 - line 49 * * column 34, line 64 - column 35, line 12 * * column 37, line 7 - line 17 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 4,12-14; | [Y] - Matei Zaharia ET AL, "Job Scheduling for Multi-User MapReduce Clusters", El ectrical Engineering and Computer Sciences University of California at Berke ley, (20090430), pages 1 - 18, URL: http://www.eecs.berkeley.edu/Pubs/TechRpts/2009/EECS-2009-55.pdf, (20151118), XP055229243 [Y] 2,3 * page 5, column r, line 9 - line 22 * |