EP3081340 - POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doberenz, Matthias Raiffeisenstrasse 25A 86916 Kaufering / DE | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2016/42] | Application number, filing date | 15163321.1 | 13.04.2015 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3081340 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/08 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
B25D17/088 (EP);
B25D2217/0042 (EP);
B25D2222/42 (EP);
B25D2250/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2016/42] | English: | POWER TOOL | [2016/42] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL PORTATIVE | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2003137114 (BAUMANN OTTO [DE], et al) [I] 1,4-9 * paragraphs [0005] - [0028]; figures 1-2 * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]EP0476387 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * column 1, lines 19-25 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,4-9; | [A]EP2492054 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012315103 (AOKI YONOSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4690226 (SCHNIZLER ALBRECHT [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |