EP2950278 - DANGEROUS DRIVING EVENT REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. Kennedyplein 222 5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL | [2016/25] |
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. De Run 1115 5503 LB Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stenneth, Leon 1115 W 19th Place, Apt 2f Chicago, IL Illinois 60608 / US | 02 /
Modica, Leo 118 Hillside Drive Sawyer, MI Michigan 49125 / US | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 15163613.1 | 15.04.2015 | [2015/49] | Priority number, date | US201414291557 | 30.05.2014 Original published format: US201414291557 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2950278 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2950278 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00, G07C5/08 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
G07C5/008 (EP,US);
B60W40/103 (US);
B60W40/101 (US);
G07C5/0808 (EP,US);
G07C5/0816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2015/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MELDUNG EINES GEFÄHRLICHEN FAHREREIGNISSES | [2015/49] | English: | DANGEROUS DRIVING EVENT REPORTING | [2015/49] | French: | SIGNALEMENT D'ÉVÉNEMENT D'UNE CONDUITE DANGEREUSE | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 14.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9713208 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - page 27, line 5 * * figures 1-10 *; | [I]US2003009270 (BREED DAVID S [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0309] * * paragraph [0364] - paragraph [0379] * * paragraph [0454] - paragraph [0527] *; | [X]EP2124212 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 1/3 *; | [X]US2010324775 (KERMANI BAHRAM GHAFFARZADEH [US], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0058] ** figures 1-6; claim 45 *; | [I]US8140358 (LING RAYMOND SCOTT [US], et al) [I] 1,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - column 11, line 19 *; | [I]GB2498793 (EUI LTD [GB]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - page 14, line 4 * |