Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2975204
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.07.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
21.08.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
21.08.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
18.08.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.06.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.08.2017 |
First examination report |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.01.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
29.01.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
19.01.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
16.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|