|
06.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2023 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2023 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2015 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |