EP3082158 - PRESSING DEVICE FOR PRESSING A COMPONENT AGAINST AN ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Siemens eAutomotive France SAS 14 Avenue des Beguines 95800 Cergy / FR | [2022/46] |
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states Valeo Siemens eAutomotive Norway AS Gråterudveien 41 3036 Drammen / NO | ||
Former [2016/42] | For all designated states Valeo Powertrain Energy Conversion AS Graterudveien 41 3036 Drammen / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPANGBERG, Erik VALEO - POWERTRAIN ENERGY CONVERSION AS Olaf Morchsvei 32 3038 Drammen / NO | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Valeo Powertrain Systems Service Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble le Delta 14, avenue des Béguines 95892 Cergy Pontoise / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Tran, Chi-Hai Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Propriété Industrielle 8, Rue Louis Lormand BP 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15163907.7 | 16.04.2015 | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082158 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/40 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
H01L23/40 (EP);
H01L23/4093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRESSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ANDRÜCKEN EINES BAUTEILS GEGEN EIN ELEMENT | [2016/42] | English: | PRESSING DEVICE FOR PRESSING A COMPONENT AGAINST AN ELEMENT | [2016/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRESSION POUR UN COMPOSANT CONTRE UN ÉLÉMENT | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE8811128U (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG) [X] 1-6,8-11 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 14 * * page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 9; figures 1-4 * [A] 7; | [XA]DE102010042211 (ETA PLUS ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-4 * [A] 7; | [A] - "TABLE OF CONTENTS: THE MAX CLIP SYSTEM(TM) CLIP - Aavid", (20050101), pages 1 - 40, URL: http://www.aavid.com/sites/default/files/literature/MaxClip-Extrusion-Profiles-Catalog.pdf, (20121101), XP055042899 [A] 1-11 * page 4; figure 1 * |