EP2952514 - N1/N2-LACTAM ACETYL-COA CARBOXYLASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bagley, Scott William Pfizer Global Research and Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
Dow, Robert Lee Pfizer Global Research and Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 03 /
Griffith, David Andrew Pfizer Global Research and Development 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 04 /
Smith, Aaron Christopher Pfizer Global Research and Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 15164071.1 | 18.10.2011 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | US20100408127P | 29.10.2010 Original published format: US 408127 P | US201161531744P | 07.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161531744 P | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2952514 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/20, C07D519/00, A61K31/435 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
C07D471/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/438 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | N1/N2-LACTAM-ACETYL-COA-CARBOXYLASEHEMMER | [2015/50] | English: | N1/N2-LACTAM ACETYL-COA CARBOXYLASE INHIBITORS | [2015/50] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA N1/N2-LACTAME ACÉTYL-COA CARBOXYLASE | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 14.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11784783.0 / EP2632925 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2123652 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [I] 1-11 * page 17, line 54; example 89; claim - * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]WO2009144555 (PFIZER [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * example 1; claim - *; | [YP]WO2011058474 (PFIZER [US], et al) [YP] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [YP]WO2011058473 (PFIZER [US], et al) [YP] 1-11* example -; claim - * | by applicant | US2002100 | WO03018586 | WO03072197 | WO03072578 | US6818658 | US2005267100 | WO2005116014 | WO2005116034 | US2006178501 | WO2007011809 | EP0901786 | WO2007122482 | WO2008065508 | WO2009016462 | WO2009144554 | WO2009144555 | WO2010013161 | WO2010023594 | WO2010086820 | WO2010103437 | WO2010103438 | WO2010106457 | WO2010128425 | WO2010128414 | WO2010140092 | WO2011005611 | - ABU-ETHEIGA, L. ET AL., "Acetyl-CoA carboxylase 2 mutant mice are protected against obesity and diabetes induced by high-fat/high-carbohydrate diets", PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, no. 18, pages 10207 - 10212 | - CHOI, C.S. ET AL., "Continuous fat oxidation in acetyl-CoA carboxylase 2 knockout mice increases total energy expenditure, reduces fat mass, and improves insulin sensitivity", PNAS, (2007), vol. 104, no. 42, pages 16480 - 16485 | - SAVAGE, D.B. ET AL., "Reversal of diet-induced hepatic steatosis and hepatic insulin resistance by antisense oligonucleotide inhibitors of acetyl-CoA carboxylases 1 and 2", J CLIN INVEST | - OH, W. ET AL., "Glucose and fat metabolism in adipose tissue of acetyl-CoA carboxylase 2 knockout mice", PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, no. 5, pages 1384 - 1389 | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - TAKEUCHI, H. ET AL., "Enhancement of the dissolution rate of a poorly water-soluble drug (tolbutamide) by a spray-drying solvent deposition method and dislntegrants", J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1987), vol. 39, pages 769 - 773 | - ZIMMET, P.Z. ET AL., "The Metabolic Syndrome: Perhaps an Etiologic Mystery but Far From a Myth - Where Does the International Diabetes Federation Stand?", DIABETES & ENDOCRINOLOAV, (2005), vol. 7, no. 2 | - ALBERTI, K.G. ET AL., "The Metabolic Syndrome - A New Worldwide Definition", LANCET, (2005), vol. 366, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(05)67402-8, pages 1059 - 62, XP025277749 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(05)67402-8 | - ZHANG, S. ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2007), vol. 12, no. 9/10, pages 373 - 381 | - E.C. CHAO ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (201007), vol. 9, pages 551 - 559 | - DEMONG, D.E. ET AL., ANNUAL REPORTS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 43, pages 119 - 137 | - JONES, R.M. ET AL., MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 44, pages 149 - 170 | - KHARITONENKOV, A. ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (2009), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 359 - 364 | - ZHONG, M., CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 386 - 396 | - MEDINA, J.C., ANNUAL REPORTS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 43, pages 75 - 85 | - CARPINO, P.A.; GOODWIN, B., EXPERT OPIN. THER. PAT, (2010), vol. 20, no. 12, pages 1627 - 51 | - LI ET AL., J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 44, page 749 | - TRUONG, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2009), vol. 19, page 4920 | - ORGANIC AND BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 2612 - 2618 | - L. GAO ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. B, (2007), vol. 853, pages 303 - 313 |