EP3081603 - SURFACE COATING COMPOSITION FOR FORMATION OF FILMS HAVING HIGH WATER VAPOR PERMEABILITY AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Betek Boya ve Kimya Sanayi A.S. G.O.S.B. Tembelova Alani 3200 Sokak No: 3206 Gebze Kocaeli / TR | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orbay, Murat BETEK BOYA VE KIMYA SANAYI A.S. G.O.S.B. Tembelova Alani 3200 Sokak No: 3206 Gebze Kocaeli / TR | 02 /
Kurt, Salih Zeki BETEK BOYA VE KIMYA SANAYI A.S. G.O.S.B. Tembelova Alani 3200 Sokak No: 3206 Gebze Kocaeli / TR | 03 /
Somtürk, Sabit Mert BETEK BOYA VE KIMYA SANAYI A.S. G.O.S.B. Tembelova Alani 3200 Sokak No: 3206 Gebze Kocaeli / TR | 04 /
Eren, Mesutren BETEK BOYA VE KIMYA SANAYI A.S. G.O.S.B. Tembelova Alani 3200 Sokak No: 3206 Gebze Kocaeli / TR | 05 /
Emek, Inci Yaprak BETEK BOYA VE KIMYA SANAYI A.S. G.O.S.B. Tembelova Alani 3200 Sokak No: 3206 Gebze Kocaeli / TR | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [2016/42] | Application number, filing date | 15164130.5 | 17.04.2015 | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3081603 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09D7/12 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP);
C08K2003/2265 (EP);
C08K2003/265 (EP);
C08K2003/327 (EP);
C08K3/26 (EP);
C08K3/34 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BILDUNG VON SCHICHTEN MIT HOHER WASSERDAMPFDURCHLÄSSIGKEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/42] | English: | SURFACE COATING COMPOSITION FOR FORMATION OF FILMS HAVING HIGH WATER VAPOR PERMEABILITY AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2016/42] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE POUR LA FORMATION DE FILMS AYANT UNE FORTE PERMÉABILITÉ À LA VAPEUR D'EAU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 17.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09158051 ; | [X]JP2001354899 ; | [X]JPS6346258 ; | [A]CN103360874 ; | [X]WO0138425 (TRESPAPHAN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * examples 3,5; claims 3,4; tables 3,5 *; | [XI]US2010276626 (SEITZER JOACHIM [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0038] - [0044] - [0 54] - [0056]; examples A, B; claims 28-31; table 1 * [I] 5,8-12; | [A]US2014179859 (CHEN YUE [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A] - Alan Rawle, "BASIC PRINCIPLES OF PARTICLE SIZE ANALYSIS", (20080101), URL: http://www.rci.rutgers.edu/~moghe/PSD Basics.pdf, (20111011), XP055009141 [A] 1-12 * pages 1,2 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 34, Database accession no. 1997-370134, XP002745223 & JPH09158051 A 19970617 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * example 2 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 33, Database accession no. 2002-286965, XP002745224 & JP2001354899 A 20011225 (KOMATSU SEIREN KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 14, Database accession no. 1988-095566, XP002745225 & JPS6346258 A 19880227 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 27, Database accession no. 2014-A27202, XP002745226 & CN103360874 A 20131023 (TIANCHANG KAILIN CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | US3870553 | DE19725761 | WO0011089 | WO03018676 | WO03027165 | WO2007125038 | WO2008151997 | WO2011066160 | - Ullmann's Enzyk!opadie der technischen Chemie, vol. 15, page 667 | - V. BRITO; T. D. GONCA!VES; P. FARIA, J. COAT. TECHNOL. RES., (2011), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 513 - 525 | - W. BRACHACZEK, "The modeling technology of protective silicone coatings in terms of selected physical properties: Hydrophobicity, scrub resistance and water vapour diffusion", PROGRESS IN ORGANIC COATINGS, (2014), vol. 77, pages 859 - 867 |