Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6335012B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B2 | JP2015210749 | 24.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014093397 | 30.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2945099 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2019 | B1 | EP2945099 | 18.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014093397 | 30.04.2014 |