EP3086279 - IMAGE SYNTHESIZER FOR A DRIVER ASSISTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Györi, Marton Tatra u. 52 I/5 1136 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Németh, Huba Gyékényes u. 57 I/5 1116 Budapest / HU | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 15164945.6 | 24.04.2015 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086279 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G06T3/4038 (EP,US);
B60R1/27 (EP,US);
B60R2300/105 (US);
B60R2300/303 (US);
B60R2300/607 (US);
G06T2200/32 (US);
H04N23/90 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDSYNTHESIZER FÜR EIN FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM | [2016/43] | English: | IMAGE SYNTHESIZER FOR A DRIVER ASSISTING SYSTEM | [2016/43] | French: | SYNTHÉTISEUR D'IMAGE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2002354468 (CLARION CO LTD); | [XY]US2012069153 (MOCHIZUKI RYO [JP], et al); | [YA]US2012154592 (MIZUTA MASAKI [JP]); | [Y]EP2739050 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]); |