EP3035376 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRE-ALIGNING A FLAT SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mechatronic Systemtechnik GmbH Tiroler Strasse 80 9500 Villach / AT | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oremus, Alexander Falkenweg 17/5 9500 Villach / AT | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Straße 13 81667 München / DE | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 15165412.6 | 28.04.2015 | [2016/25] | Priority number, date | DE201410118833 | 17.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014118833 | [2016/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3035376 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/68 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
H01L21/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VORAUSRICHTEN EINES FLACHEN SUBSTRATS | [2016/25] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRE-ALIGNING A FLAT SUBSTRATE | [2016/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DESTINÉS À PRÉ-ALIGNER UN SUBSTRAT LIQUIDE | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010319209 (NAKAMURA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,11-13,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 4-6,9,10,14; | [YA]EP0490324 (DISCO CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 27 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,11; | [YA]EP0639855 (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * column 8, line 8 - column 11, line 44 * * figures 3,6 * [A] 1,11; | [YA]DE102010019448 (ROIDER PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 9,10,14 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 1 * [A] 1,11; | [A]US4696712 (NONAKA YUZO [JP]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * |