EP2940667 - DANGER WARNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states detectomat GmbH An der Strusbek 5 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | [2017/27] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states Job Lizenz GmbH & Co. KG Kurt-Fischer-Strasse 30 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krüger, Sven Ludwig-Suhl-Ring 11 23556 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Jörg Schwarze Heide 10 23568 Lübeck / DE | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15165713.7 | 29.04.2015 | [2015/45] | Priority number, date | DE201410106120 | 30.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014106120 | [2015/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2940667 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2940667 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/103 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
G08B17/103 (EP);
G08B17/113 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2015/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFAHRENMELDER | [2015/45] | English: | DANGER WARNING SYSTEM | [2015/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALARME | [2015/45] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013093594 (BRIGHAM PETER [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraphs [0036] - [0040]; figure 6b * [I] 5,6; | [XI]US6288647 (YAMANO NAOTO [JP]) [X] 1,2,10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 8; figure 27 * [I] 3-6; | [XAI]US5170150 (AUSTIN GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 2 * [A] 5,6 [I] 10; | [XAI]US2008018485 (KADWELL BRIAN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figure 3c * * paragraphs [0054] - [0061] * [A] 8,9 [I] 3-5,10; | [I]WO2011108441 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 8 * | by applicant | WO0150432 | DE3608393 |