EP2953427 - LED POWER CIRCUIT AND LAMP USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumion Tech Co., Ltd. 5 F., No. 19, Ln. 12, Xingzhong Rd. Nangang Dist. 11579 Taipei City / TW | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hung, Yi-Sung 3 F, No. 26, Ln. 25, Zhuangjing Rd., Banqiao Dist. 22042 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Chen, Hsieh-Chia 5 F, No. 18-5, Aly. 20, Ln. 216, Dongshi St., 20th Neighborhood, Dongshi Vil., Xizhi Dist. 22141 New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Ho, Chien-Wen No. 11, Aly. 9, Ln. 283, Chenggong Rd. 32555 Longtan Township, Taoyuan County / TW | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15165847.3 | 30.04.2015 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | TW20140209701U | 30.05.2014 Original published format: TW 103209701 U | TW20150100945 | 12.01.2015 Original published format: TW 104100945 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953427 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
H05B47/25 (EP);
H05B45/50 (EP,US);
H05B45/397 (EP);
Y02B20/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-LEISTUNGSSCHALTUNG UND LAMPE DAMIT | [2015/50] | English: | LED POWER CIRCUIT AND LAMP USING THE SAME | [2015/50] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ALIMENTATION DE DEL ET LAMPE UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 10.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 18.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009278465 (FARMER RONALD [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * page 1, paragraphs 5, 8-10; figure 2 * * page 2, paragraphs 27-33 *; | [XAYI]US2010289418 (LANGOVSKY NICK [US]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 2, 6-8 * * page 1, paragraph 19 - page 9, paragraph 77 * [A] 6 [Y] 2-4 [I] 5,9,10; | [XAYI]WO2011014963 (LED ROADWAY LIGHTING LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 7 * * page 7, paragraph 21 - page 12, paragraph 36 * [A] 6 [Y] 2-4 [I] 9,10; | [A]EP2458722 (SAMSUNG LED CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11* page 3 - page 4, paragraph 32; figure 2 *; | [XAYI]KR101254712B (DSE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document * [A] 7-10 [Y] 2-4 [I] 5,6 |