EP2944219 - DEVICE FOR NAIL APPLIQUE TRANSFER, SHEET OF NAIL APPLIQUES AND METHOD FOR NAIL APPLIQUE TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JC Korea Corp. 77, Deokcheon-ro 72beon-gil Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Dong Sung 204-103, 15, Eonnam-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Hyun Surk 608-2201, 248, Jeongjail-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Kyung Sik 105-403, 29, Yeonhyeon-ro, Manan-gu, Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Ju Young 111-110, 296, Sanbon-ro, Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Choi, Jeong Rim 1-5, Sujeongnam-ro 164beon-gil, Sujeong-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Bo Mi 323-2502, 62, Jamsil-ro, Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2015/47] | Application number, filing date | 15165950.5 | 30.04.2015 | [2015/47] | Priority number, date | KR20140059123 | 16.05.2014 Original published format: KR 20140059123 | [2015/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2944219 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A45D29/00 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
A45D29/001 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A45D29/18 (BR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR NAGELAUFLAGENÜBERTRAGUNG, NAGELAUFLAGENFILM UND VERFAHREN ZUR NAGELAUFLAGENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2015/47] | English: | DEVICE FOR NAIL APPLIQUE TRANSFER, SHEET OF NAIL APPLIQUES AND METHOD FOR NAIL APPLIQUE TRANSFER | [2015/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT D'APPLIQUE D'ONGLE ET FEUILLES D'APPLIQUE | [2015/47] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4947876 (LARSEN JEAN [US]) [X] 1,2,8,11-13,19-25 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 34; figures 1-4 * [I] 3-7,9,10,14-18,26,27; | [A]EP2486820 (KISS NAIL PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP2564724 (CHANG SUNG YONG [US]) [A] 3-7,15-17,26,27 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US2008283073 |