EP2946708 - HAND DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukaya, Yoshihiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Takaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8310 / JP | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | Hopkin, Tobias J.B. J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15166419.0 | 23.04.2008 | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2946708 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/48 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
A47K10/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2015/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HANDTROCKNER | [2015/48] | English: | HAND DRYER | [2015/48] | French: | SÈCHE-MAINS | [2015/48] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 15.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/06] | 13.09.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08740789.6 / EP2277424 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005102133 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTIAL [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; figure - *; | [A]GB2413283 (GREEN GRAHAME PETER [GB]) [A] 1-3 * page 9, line 21 - page 13, line 22; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006171660 (HSU CHI-CHIN [TW]) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]WO2007015045 (DYSON TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 6,7 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 16; figure - * | by applicant | JPH0244192 | JP2001327433 |