EP3091130 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISCHARGING BATH WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KKEquity GmbH Außenschlag 16 21521 Wohltorf / DE | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIPPENBERGER, Jens J. Außenschlag 16 D-21521 Wohltorf / DE | 02 /
KIPPENBERGER, Nils N. Außenschlag 18 D-21521 Wohltorf / DE | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2016/45] | Application number, filing date | 15166891.0 | 08.05.2015 | [2016/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091130 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/23, F24D17/00, F28C3/06, F28D21/00 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
E03C1/23 (EP);
F24D19/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSLASSEN VON BADEWASSER | [2016/45] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISCHARGING BATH WATER | [2016/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À L'ÉVACUATION D'EAU DE BAIGNADE | [2016/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2015143479 (KERR RICHARD MALCOLM [AU]) [E] 1,2,6,7,11-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB2296187 (ARCHER DAVID STUART [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [A] 11-13; | [XA]WO9600328 (NEWTON DAVID JOHN [GB]) [X] 1-3,15 * the whole document * [A] 11-13; | [XA]US2067204 (RICHARDSON WILLIAM A) [X] 1,2,6,15 * the whole document * [A] 11-13; | [E]DE202015001042U (BEN DOHHOU NADIR [DE]) [E] 1,2,6,8-10,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3925590 |