EP3093054 - FLUID TREATMENT MODULE AND ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pall Corporation 25 Harbor Park Drive Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedrich, Esther Rüdesheimer Strasse 85 b 55545 Bad Kreuznach / DE | 02 /
Meng, Manuela Neuer Weg 18 55776 Ruschberg / DE | 03 /
Leibnitz, Rüdiger Edith-Piaf-Strasse 10 55543 Bad Kreuznach / DE | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/46] | Application number, filing date | 15167208.6 | 11.05.2015 | [2016/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3093054 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/26 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
B01D15/10 (EP,US);
B01D29/39 (KR);
B01D36/04 (CN);
C12M45/00 (US);
A23L2/72 (US);
B01D29/54 (KR);
B01D35/00 (KR);
B01D39/1669 (US);
C12M33/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2016/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDBEHANDLUNGSMODUL UND -BAUGRUPPE | [2016/46] | English: | FLUID TREATMENT MODULE AND ASSEMBLY | [2016/46] | French: | MODULE ET ENSEMBLE DE TRAITEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2016/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 22.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2389431 (HALLINAN WILLIAM W) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011186505 (DIEMER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4416676 (MONTIERTH MAX R [US]) [X] 1-7,12,16 * column 5, line 54 - column 8, line 57; figures 1-1c,4 *; | [X]AU1188566 (FILTROX MASCHINENBAU AG) [X] 1-4,7-10,12,16,17 * the whole document *; | [X]DE73740 (C. SELLENSCHEIDT) [X] 1-4,7-11,16,17 * the whole document *; | [X]US2010187189 (WELCH JR THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document * |