EP2963203 - DECKING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/01] | DECK SYSTEM AND COMPONENTS | ||
[2019/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Admiral Composite Technologies, Inc. 9 Florence Street Baldwin, NY 11510 / US | [2016/22] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Carrubba, Vincent, Frank 9 Florence Street Baldwin, NY 11510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRUBBA, Vincent Frank 9 Florence Street Baldwin, NY 11510 / US | [2016/22] |
Former [2016/01] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2019/47] |
Former [2016/01] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15167391.0 | 12.05.2015 | [2016/01] | Priority number, date | US201414276402 | 13.05.2014 Original published format: US201414276402 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963203 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2963203 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/10, E04F17/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
E04F15/105 (EP);
E04F15/02016 (EP);
E04F15/02183 (EP);
E04F17/00 (EP);
E04F2015/02122 (EP);
E04F2201/0153 (EP);
E04F2203/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2016/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERKLEIDUNGSPLATTE | [2019/13] | English: | DECKING BOARD | [2019/13] | French: | PANNEAU DE REVETEMENT | [2019/13] |
Former [2016/01] | DECKSYSTEM UND -KOMPONENTEN | ||
Former [2016/01] | DECK SYSTEM AND COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2016/01] | SYSTÈME ET ÉLÉMENTS DE PONT | Examination procedure | 05.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2018 | 31.05.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2015 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | IE | 12.05.2020 | LU | 12.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.05.2015 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013219806 (CARRUBBA VINCENT FRANK [US]) [X] 1,8-10,13 * paragraph [0097]; figure 8a * [I] 2-7,11,12; | [XI]US2004031227 (KNAUSEDER FRANZ [AT]) [X] 1-4,8,10,13 * the whole document * [I] 5-7,11; | [XI]WO2004053257 (PERGO EUROP AB [SE]) [X] 1,8,9,13 * the whole document * [I] 7 | Examination | US2004035077 | WO2006032378 | WO2006104436 |