EP2945466 - LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE LIGHTING DEVICE HAVING MULTIPLE DRIVING STAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IML HongKong Limited Flat/Rm 1901, 19/F. Lee Garden One 33 Hysan Avenue Causeway Bay Hong Kong / HK | [2021/22] |
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states IML International PO Box 309, Ugland House 1-1104 Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Horng-Bin No. 5, Ln. 16, Jixiang Rd Songshan Dist. Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Li, Yi-Mei 4F., No. 52 Zhongyang 7th St. Xindian Dist. New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Chiang, Yung-Hsin 8F., No.19, Anxing Rd. Xindian Dist. New Taipei City / TW | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Williams, Lisa Estelle Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15167698.8 | 13.05.2015 | [2015/47] | Priority number, date | US201414277029 | 13.05.2014 Original published format: US201414277029 | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2945466 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2945466 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
H05B45/48 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2015/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTDIODENBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN ANSTEUERUNGSSTUFEN | [2015/47] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE LIGHTING DEVICE HAVING MULTIPLE DRIVING STAGES | [2015/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE À DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE AYANT DE MULTIPLES ÉTAGES D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2015/47] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 10.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.03.2022 | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/32] | 31.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.04.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2019 | 31.05.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2013127354 (CHIANG YUNG-HSIN [TW], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9 * page 1, paragraph 3; figures 4, 5, 6, 11, 12, 18, 19, 20 * * page 1, paragraph 9 - page 2, paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 20 - page 3, paragraph 23 * * page 4, paragraph 29 - page 5, paragraph 39 * * page 7, paragraph 56 - page 8, paragraph 59 * [Y] 2-5 [I] 8,10; | [Y]US2011194311 (GAKNOKI YURY [US], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 4, paragraph 31 * * page 6, paragraph 44 - page 7, paragraph 48 *; | [Y]WO2013100736 (SEOUL SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013257298 (CHEON JEONG IN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |