EP3096117 - A TEMPERATURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Limerick Plassey Technological Park Limerick / IE | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poeggel, Sven Alte Dorfstrasse 50a 18184 Neu Broderstorf / DE | 02 /
Duraibabu, Dinesh Babu c/o C2-051 Main Building University of Limerick Castleroy County Limerick / IE | 03 /
Leen, Gabriel 3 Ardfield Mews Grange Douglas Limerick / IE | 04 /
Dooly, Gerard 71 Glenside Annacotty Limerick / IE | 05 /
Lewis, Elfed Cappakea O'Briens Bridge County Clare / IE | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Keane, David Colman Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15168623.5 | 21.05.2015 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096117 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01K5/02, G01K11/32, G01K5/32 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
G01K11/3206 (EP);
G01K5/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSENSOR | [2016/47] | English: | A TEMPERATURE SENSOR | [2016/47] | French: | CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2016/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004009957 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 2-6 * * page 6, line 12 - page 11, line 18 *; | [XI] - SVEN POEGGEL ET AL, "Miniature Optical fiber combined pressure- and temperature sensor for medical applications", 2013 IEEE SENSORS, IEEE, (20121028), doi:10.1109/ICSENS.2012.6411305, ISSN 1930-0395, pages 1 - 4, XP032308758 [X] 1,2,5-10,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 1, paragraph I - page 4, paragraph IV * [I] 3,4,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSENS.2012.6411305 | [A] - HYUN-KYU KANG ET AL, "Simultaneous monitoring of strain and temperature during and after cure of unsymmetric composite laminate using fibre-optic sensors; Simultaneous monitoring of strain and temperature of composite laminate using fibre-optic sensors", SMART MATERIALS AND STRUCTURES, IOP PUBLISHING LTD., BRISTOL, GB, (20030110), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1088/0964-1726/12/1/304, ISSN 0964-1726, pages 29 - 35, XP020071708 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, column left - page 3, column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0964-1726/12/1/304 | by applicant | US8764678 |