EP2947817 - CREDIT CONTROL IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone IP Licensing Limited The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moughton, John c/o Group Legal (Patents), Vodafone Group Services Limited, One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London, W2 6BY / GB | 02 /
Awuah, Benjamin c/o Group Legal (Patents), Vodafone Group Services Limited, One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London, W2 6BY / GB | 03 /
Davies, Rhys c/o Group Legal (Patents), Vodafone Group Services Limited, One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London, W2 6BY / GB | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15168774.6 | 21.05.2015 | [2015/48] | Priority number, date | GB20140009153 | 22.05.2014 Original published format: GB 201409153 | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947817 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04M15/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP,GB,US);
H04L12/1482 (US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04M15/31 (EP,US);
H04M15/41 (EP,US);
H04M15/66 (EP,US);
H04M15/8038 (EP,US);
H04M15/8214 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2015/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREDITSTEUERUNG IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2015/48] | English: | CREDIT CONTROL IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2015/48] | French: | CONTRÔLE DE CRÉDIT DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2015/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 09.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003186678 (LUCIDARME THIERRY [FR], et al) [X] 1,7-9,19-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0051] * * figure 1 * [I] 2-6,10-18; | [XI] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Telecommunication management; Charging management; Charging data description for the Packet Switched (PS) domain (3GPP TS 32.215 version 5.9.0 Release 5); ETSI TS 132 215", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20050623), vol. 3-SA5, no. V5.9.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014030705 [X] 1,7-9,19-21 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [05.8] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [07.6] * * paragraph [000A] * [I] 2-6,10-18 |