EP2940809 - DIODE LASERS TYPE OF DEVICES WITH GOOD COUPLING BETWEEN FIELD DISTRIBUTION AND GAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petrescu-Prahova, Iulian Basarab 260 Liberty Bell Court North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2021/45] |
Former [2015/45] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15168957.7 | 16.02.2006 | [2015/45] | Priority number, date | US20050654648P | 18.02.2005 Original published format: US 654648 P | US20050686880P | 02.06.2005 Original published format: US 686880 P | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2940809 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2940809 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/40, // H01S5/20, H01S5/065 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
H01S5/20 (EP);
H01S5/4031 (EP);
H01S5/4081 (EP);
H01S2301/18 (EP);
H01S5/0655 (EP);
H01S5/2004 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2015/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DIODENLASERVORRICHTUNGEN MIT GUTER KOPPLUNG ZWISCHEN FELDVERTEILUNG UND ZUWACHS | [2015/45] | English: | DIODE LASERS TYPE OF DEVICES WITH GOOD COUPLING BETWEEN FIELD DISTRIBUTION AND GAIN | [2015/45] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE TYPE LASERS À DIODE PRÉSENTANT UN COUPLAGE SATISFAISANT ENTRE LA DISTRIBUTION DE CHAMP ET LE GAIN | [2015/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06735170.0 / EP1849221 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2006 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | TR | 10.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IE | 16.02.2022 | LU | 16.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | FR | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.02.2006 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IE | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.02.2006 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IE | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IE | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IE | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IE | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4712220 (LUFT JOHANN [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 51 - line 55 * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US4722089 (BOTEZ DAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 4; figures 2a-2f *; | [X]US5159604 (MEHUYS DAVID G [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 46; figures 2, 3A-3C *; | [X] - KATZ J ET AL, "PHASE-LOCKED SEMICONDUCTOR LASER ARRAY WITH SEPARATE CONTACTS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, (19830915), vol. 43, no. 6, doi:10.1063/1.94424, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 521 - 523, XP000706270 [X] 1,3 * page 521, column l, line l, paragraph l - page 521, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 522, column r, paragraph l - page 523, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.94424 | [A] - WELCH D F ET AL, "HIGH POWER CW OPERATION OF PHASED ARRAY DIODE LASERS WITH DIFFRACTION LIMITED OUTPUT BEAM", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, (19851201), vol. 47, no. 11, doi:10.1063/1.96353, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1134 - 1136, XP000706674 [A] 1 * page 1136, column l, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.96353 |