08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
24.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
20.05.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.02.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
22.02.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2017 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
17.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
17.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
28.10.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
19.04.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
27.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|