EP3098219 - METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING CYCLIC CARBONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÉMERY, Thérèse Rambla de Catalunya 48 3-2 08007 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
KINZELMANN, Hans-Georg Dhünnstr. 10 50259 Pulheim / DE | 03 /
SEBASTIÁN PÉREZ, Rosa María Rambla Sant Jordi 79 1st 2nd Ripollet 08291 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
MARQUET CORTÉS, Jorge Jordi Girona 14 08034 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
WANG, Yongxia 24 Huntley Way Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 06 /
AGUILERA CORROCHANO, Jorge Carrer Crueta 119 1D Sabadell 08202 Barcelona / ES | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/48] | 01 /
HÉMERY, Thérèse Rambla de Catalunya 48 3-2 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
02 /
KINZELMANN, Hans-Georg Dhünnstr. 10 50259 Pulheim / DE | |||
03 /
SEBASTIÁN PÉREZ, Rosa María Rambla Sant Jordi 79 1st 2nd Ripollet 08291 Barcelona / ES | |||
04 /
MARQUET CORTÉS, Jorge Jordi Girona 14 08034 Barcelona / ES | |||
05 /
WANG, Yongxia 24 Huntley Way Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
06 /
AGUILERA, Jorge Carrer Crueta 119 1D Sabadell 08202 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 15169447.8 | 27.05.2015 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098219 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3098219 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/36 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
C07D317/36 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B01J23/04 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B01J27/08 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C08G64/34 (CN,RU,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | C07D317/36, C08G59/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON CYCLISCHEN CARBONATEN | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING CYCLIC CARBONATES | [2016/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE CARBONATES CYCLIQUES | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 05.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2015 | AL | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IE | 27.05.2018 | LU | 27.05.2018 | MT | 27.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
CY | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MK | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
MT | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
MT | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
MT | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6258962 (BUCHANAN J SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, paragraph 1 * * column 7, paragraph l * | [AD] - KIHARA, N. ET AL., "Catalytic activity of various salts in the reaction of 2,3-epoxypropyl phenyl ether and carbon dioxide under atmospheric pressure", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 58, no. 23, doi:10.1021/jo00075a011, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 6198 - 6202, XP055006105 [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * page 6199; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00075a011 | [A] - ANDREOZZI, R. ET AL., "Sintesi dei carbonati di alchilene con alogenuri alcalini supportati su carbone attivo", CHIMICA E L'INDUSTRIA, SOCIETA CHIMICA ITALIANO, MILANO, IT, (1985), vol. 67, no. 9, ISSN 0009-4315, pages 481 - 483, XP009187052 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - LIANG, S. ET AL., "Highly efficient synthesis of cyclic carbonates from CO2 and epoxides over cellulose/KI", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, GB, (20101224), vol. 47, no. 7, doi:10.1039/C0CC04829A, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 2131 - 2133, XP055227111 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C0CC04829A | [A] - TAKAHASHI, T. ET AL., "Synergistic hybrid catalyst for cyclic carbonate synthesis: Remarkable acceleration caused by immobilization of homogeneous catalyst on silica", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, GB, (2006), no. 15, doi:10.1039/b517140g, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 1664 - 1666, XP055227107 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b517140g | [AD] - HAN, L. ET AL., "Silica grafted imidazolium-based ionic liquids: efficient heterogeneous catalysts for chemical fixation of CO2 to a cyclic carbonate", ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, UK, (2009), vol. 2, no. 12, doi:10.1039/b910763k, ISSN 1754-5692, pages 1286 - 1292, XP055224869 [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * Scheme 3; page 1288, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b910763k | by applicant | US8118968 | US7232877 | DE3600602 | - FLEISCHER ET AL., GREEN CHEM., (2013), vol. 15, pages 934 - 942 | - ROSHAN ET AL., GREEN CHEM., (2012), vol. 14, pages 2933 - 2940 | - KIHARA ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, pages 6198 - 6202 | - HAN ET AL., ENERGY ENVIRON. SCI., (2009), vol. 2, pages 1286 - 1292 | - DAI ET AL., APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, (2009), vol. 366, pages 2 - 12 | - MOTOKURA ET AL., GREEN CHEM., (2009), vol. 11, pages 1876 - 1880 | - C. TING ET AL., CHINESE JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (2012), vol. 3, page 416 |