EP2950024 - METHOD FOR SUPPLYING POWER TO CERAMIC KILNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZBK Zentrum für Baukeramik GmbH Schubertstraße 12 92521 Schwarzenfeld / DE | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horvath, Peter Utzenhofenerstr. 5 92280 Kastl / DE | 02 /
Wurst, Roland Am Blumacker 5 71549 Auenwald / DE | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neumarkter Strasse 18 81673 München / DE | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 15169707.5 | 28.05.2015 | [2015/49] | Priority number, date | DE20141008218 | 28.05.2014 Original published format: DE102014008218 | [2015/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950024 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F27B9/20, F27B9/30, F27D17/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
F27B9/20 (EP);
F27B9/3005 (EP);
F27D17/004 (EP);
Y02P40/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIEVERSORGUNG KERAMISCHER ÖFEN | [2015/49] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPLYING POWER TO CERAMIC KILNS | [2015/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE DE POÊLES CÉRAMIQUES | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4328301 (FHW BRENNTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 29 * [Y] 2-8; | [YA]DE3923887 (MANFRED LEISENBERG KG [DE]) [Y] 2-8 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 3 - line 11 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 1 * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE4328301 | DE102011100736 | DE1558062 | DE507880 | DE431357 | DE702988 | DE530993 | CH247399 |