EP3098008 - METHOD OF DISPOSING A CUTTING WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meyer Burger AG Schorenstrasse 39 3645 Gwatt (Thun) / CH | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyon, Fernando Pappelweg 9 3600 Thun / CH | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | PPR AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 15169984.0 | 29.05.2015 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098008 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23D57/00, B28D5/04 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
B23D57/0023 (EP);
B23D57/0061 (EP);
B28D5/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANORDNUNG EINES SCHNITTDRAHTS | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD OF DISPOSING A CUTTING WIRE | [2016/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DISPOSITION D'UN FIL DE COUPE | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 31.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 17.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 17.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JP2013163256 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * in particular: * * figure - * [A] 12-15; | [XA]JP2003071698 (TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIP) [X] 12-15 * abstract * [A] 1-11 |