EP2952281 - FIXTURE FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE JOINING AND METHOD USING A CORRESPONDING FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/50] | Fixture for high temperature joining | ||
[2016/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225-1103 / US | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhodes, Jeffrey F 6607 West Deerfield Drive Zionsville, IN Indiana 46077 / US | 02 /
Nash, Christopher Owen 7534 Silverpine Ct. Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46250 / US | 03 /
Garner, Rusty M 23 Oakwood Court Brownsburg, IN Indiana 46112 / US | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2015/50] | HGF Limited Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15170060.6 | 01.06.2015 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | US201462006763P | 02.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462006763 P | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2952281 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2952281 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2952281 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/08, B23K1/00, B23K37/04, B23Q3/06, B25B5/14, B25B11/00, B23K20/26, B23K20/233, B23K20/16, B23K20/02, // B23K101/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
B23K3/087 (EP,US);
B23K1/0018 (EP,US);
B23K20/002 (US);
B23K20/023 (EP,US);
B23K20/16 (EP,US);
B23K20/233 (EP,US);
B23K20/26 (EP,US);
B23K37/0426 (EP,US);
B23K37/0443 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/50] | B23K3/08, B23K1/00, B23K37/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Title | German: | HALTERUNG ZUM HOCHTEMPERATURVERBINDEN UND VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER ENTSPRECHENDEN HALTERUNG | [2017/32] | English: | FIXTURE FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE JOINING AND METHOD USING A CORRESPONDING FIXTURE | [2017/32] | French: | FIXATION POUR JONCTION A TEMPERATURE ELEVEE ET METHODE UTILISANT UNE FIXATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2017/32] |
Former [2015/50] | HALTERUNG ZUM HOCHTEMPERATURVERBINDEN | ||
Former [2015/50] | Fixture for high temperature joining | ||
Former [2015/50] | FIXATION POUR JONCTION A TEMPERATURE ELEVEE | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 13.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2015 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | RS | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | IE | 01.06.2018 | LU | 01.06.2018 | MT | 01.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 01.06.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
MT | 01.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 01.06.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
MT | 01.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
MT | 01.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
MT | 01.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
MT | 01.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 01.06.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 01.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1799019 (MISCHLER WILLIAM N) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, lines 41-50 * * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 31; figure - *; | [Y]US4058880 (HUGHEY EMERSON DEE) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, lines 27-35; figure - *; | [Y]JPH11197827 (SHIMEO SEIMITSU KK) [Y] 2,11 * abstract ** paragraph [0017]; figure - *; | [XAI]DE10026829 (PRIB ARTHUR [DE]) [X] 1,5-9 * paragraphs [0049] - [0051] - [0054] - [0055]; figures 1,6-9 * [A] 10 [I] 4; | [XA]GB2458738 (HELLER MACHINE TOOLS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,5-9 * page 7, lines 8-17; figure - * [A] 10 |